HONOURABLE MR. COPPING
304/2021 |
ALBERTA HEALTH ACT (section 3) - Effective November 8, 2021, reappoints Janice L. Harrington as the Health Advocate for a term to expire on November 7, 2023. |
305/2021 |
MENTAL HEALTH ACT (section 45) - Effective November 8, 2021, reappoints Janice L. Harrington as the Mental Health Patient Advocate for a term to expire on November 7, 2023. |
HONOURABLE MR. NICOLAIDES
306/2021 |
POST-SECONDARY LEARNING ACT (sections 44 and 56) - Effective December 11, 2021, reappoints Janet Annesley as a member of the Board of Governors of the Southern Alberta Institute of Technology for a term to expire on December 10, 2024. |
307/2021 |
POST-SECONDARY LEARNING ACT (sections 44 and 56) - Designates Joe MacNeil as chair of The Board of Governors of Keyano College; appoints Michelle Toner as a member of The Board of Governors of Keyano College for a term to expire on November 2, 2024. |
308/2021 |
POST-SECONDARY LEARNING ACT (sections 44 and 56) - Appoints Mark Hodson, Paul Rattan and Shannon Wyzykoski as members of The Board of Governors of Red Deer Polytechnic, each for a term to expire on November 2, 2024. |
HONOURABLE MR. SHANDRO
309/2021 |
PROVINCIAL OFFENCES PROCEDURE ACT (section 42) - Makes the Procedures Amendment Regulation. |
HONOURABLE MR. TOEWS
310/2021 |
INSURANCE ACT (section 498); INSURANCE COUNCILS REGULATION (sections 2 and 6) - Appoints Larry Bohn as a member and chair of the Alberta Insurance Council for a term to expire on November 2, 2024; appoints David Weyant, Q.C., as a member of the Alberta Insurance Council for a term to expire on November 2, 2024. |
Orders in Council can now be viewed on the King's Printer website at: https://kings-printer.alberta.ca/507.cfm